(HC)Green v. Cueva
Petitioner: Dameshlo A. Green
Respondent: Daniel E. Cueva
Case Number: 2:2021cv02414
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-2414 KJM KJN (HC). (Plummer, M)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Feinstat, Max)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/2022. Consent or Decline due by 2/7/2022. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/2022 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Daniel E. Cueva by Dameshlo A. Green #1 Civil Cover Sheet). PAYMENT for habeas petition filing fee in the amount of $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-9990251 (Marshall, Marilee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Green v. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dameshlo A. Green
Represented By: Marilee Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel E. Cueva
Represented By: Max Feinstat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?