Emergy, Inc. v. Better Meat Company et al
Plaintiff: Emergy, Inc. Doing business as Meati Foods
Defendant: The Better Meat Co., Augustus Pattillo and Better Meat Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02417
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
3 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to DISMISS by Better Meat Company, Augustus Pattillo. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Borden, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Borden on behalf of Better Meat Company, Augustus Pattillo. Attorney Borden, Matthew added. (Borden, Matthew)
February 10, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/10/2022: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/21/2022 is RESET for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 8, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Emergy, Inc. re #22 Patent New Case Documents for KJM,. (Mroz, David)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* US 11,058,137 B2 * * 7/13/2021 * * The Better Meat Co * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Patent Report, #4 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/22 ORDERING that case number 2:21-cv-02417-WBS-JDP is REASSIGNED from Senior Judge William B. Shubb to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:21-cv-02417-KJM-CKD. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/28/2022. GRANTING #16 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Luke J. McCammon, for Emergy, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/28/2022 GRANTING #15 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sonja W. Sahlsten, for Emergy, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/28/2022 GRANTING #14 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John M. Williamson, for Emergy, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/28/2022 GRANTING #13 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David K. Mroz, for Emergy, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
January 28, 2022 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emergy, Inc. for attorney Luke McCammon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10048424) (Smyth, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emergy, Inc. for attorney Sonja W. Sahlsten to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10048385) (Smyth, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emergy, Inc. for attorney John M. Williamson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10048362) (Smyth, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emergy, Inc. for attorney David K. Mroz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10048340) (Smyth, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2022 GRANTING #11 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Eric Schlabs, PHV for Augustus Pattillo, and The Better Meat Co. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Huang, H)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co. for attorney Eric Schlabs to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number BCAEDC-10011747) (Hagey, J.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 2/16/2022, for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint by Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amy Senia on behalf of Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co.. Attorney Senia, Amy added. (Senia, Amy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by J. Noah Hagey on behalf of Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co.. Attorney Hagey, J. Noah added. (Hagey, J.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Robert Travis Petraglia on behalf of Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co.. Attorney Petraglia, Robert Travis added. (Petraglia, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M Theodore on behalf of Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co.. Attorney Theodore, Jeffrey M added. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* US 11,058,137 B2 * * 7/13/2021 * * The Better Meat Co. * ; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey Daniel Smyth* *Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP* *3300 Hillview Avenue* *Palo Alto, CA 94304*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-02338-KJM by Emergy, Inc.. (Smyth, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Emergy, Inc.. (Smyth, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Augustus Pattillo, The Better Meat Co. by Emergy, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9990767) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smyth, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergy, Inc. v. Better Meat Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergy, Inc. Doing business as Meati Foods
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Smyth
Represented By: David Mroz, PHV
Represented By: John Matthew Williamson, PHV
Represented By: Luke Joseph McCammon, PHV
Represented By: Sonja Sahlsten, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Better Meat Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustus Pattillo
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Jeffrey M Theodore
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Robert Travis Petraglia
Represented By: Eric Schlabs, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Meat Company
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Jeffrey M Theodore
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Robert Travis Petraglia
Represented By: Eric Schlabs, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?