United States of America v. Ataya et al
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Inaam Ataya and Hani Ataya
Case Number: 2:2021mc00290
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/31/2022: The court has received the parties' joint notice of settlement as to all claims. (ECF No. #8 .) Accordingly, the show cause hearing set for 2/1/2022 (ECF Nos. 3, 4), along with all other dates previously set in this matter, are VACATED. Petitioner shall file settlement/dismissal documents, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, no later than 2/22/2022. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by United States of America. Dispositional Docs due by 2/22/2022. (Tennyson, Steven)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 REPLY by United States of America re #6 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Tolling Agreement)(Tennyson, Steven)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER by Hani Ataya, Inaam Ataya. Attorney Luoma, Richard Todd added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Luoma, Richard) Modified on 1/21/2022 (Kaminski, H).
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION re 4 Minute Order by United States of America. (Tennyson, Steven) Modified on 1/21/2022 (Kaminski, H).
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/2022: Given the current state of the COVID-19 pandemic, the show cause hearing set for Tuesday, 2/1/2022 at 9:00 AM (see ECF No. 3) will now take place remotely via Zoom, instead of in person. Parties proceeding Pro Se (without counsel) will receive the Zoom appearance instructions by mail, with phone instructions included as well. The parties may contact Courtroom Deputy Alexandra Shaddox-Waldrop at (916) 930-4187 should they have any questions regarding the Zoom appearance. Counsel will receive an email containing the necessary appearance information.Before the hearing, the government SHALL file proof of service confirming that respondents were timely served with the documents described in the Show Cause Order (ECF No. 3 paragraph 2). As stated in the Show Cause Order, respondents' written defense or opposition to the enforcement petition SHALL be filed no later than Monday, 1/24/2022. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
January 19, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Minute Order with Zoom Instructions served on Hani Ataya, Inaam Ataya. (Waldrop, A) Modified on 1/19/2022 (Donati, J).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/2021 DIRECTING Respondents Hani Ataya and Inaam Ataya to appear and Show Cause on 2/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Donati, J)
December 13, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order to Show Cause served on Hani Ataya, Inaam Ataya. (Donati, J)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER re to Show Cause re Tax Summons Enforcement re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Tennyson, Steven)
December 7, 2021 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Petition to enforce IRS summons. (Reader, L)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Brian Frizzi, #3 Exhibit A)(Tennyson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ataya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Inaam Ataya
Represented By: Richard Todd Luoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hani Ataya
Represented By: Richard Todd Luoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?