(PC) Turner v. Ullery et al
Case Number: 2:2022cv00002
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/01/24 ADOPTING 85 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 91 Motion for Reconsideration. (Licea Chavez, V)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 06/05/2024 DENYING 86 Motion for Reconsideration as untimely and to the extent Plaintiff renews a Motion for Appointment of Counsel, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Nair, C)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 5/13/2024 GRANTING 87 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to 85 Findings and Recommendations. Objections due 30 days from the date of this order. (Kyono, V)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 04/19/24 RECOMMENDING that the 82 Motion to Reopen Case be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Licea Chavez, V)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/272023 ADOPTING 79 The Findings and Recommendations in full; The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/22/2023 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/6/2023 GRANTING 77 Motion and VACATING the discovery and pretrial motions deadline until further order of the court. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a change of address with the court and serve a copy on opposing counsel. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/29/2023 DENYING 73 Request that the court pay witness fees and travel costs for RN A. Davis, and DISREGARDING 73 , 74 filings as prematurely filed. (Huang, H)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/23/2023 DENYING the 64 Motion to Accommodate without prejudice and DENYING the 65 Motion to Amend without prejudice. (Spichka, K.)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/22/2022 DISMISSING 55 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint; DISCHARGING 50 Order to show cause; RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's first claim be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, and that Dr. Ratton be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Perdue, C.)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2022 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 48 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/28/2022 GRANTING plaintiff's 35 motion to amend the complaint, PARTIALLY GRANTING defendants' 47 motion for stay; STAYING discovery pending further order of the court, an d VACATING the 7/18/2022 discovery and scheduling order. The Clerk shall separately file and docket plaintiff's proposed amended complaint (ECF No. 35 at 1-7) as his amended complaint and append his exhibits (ECF No. 35 at 13-19). The am ended complaint states potentially cognizable Eighth Amendment claims for relief against defendants Dr. Ullery, Dr. Nouged, and Dr. Surineni pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). Defendants Ullery and Nouged shall file a response to the amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this order. Within 21 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why defendant Dr. Ratton should not be dismissed from this action, and why Dr. Bharat Ratton's name in claim one should not be interlineated to read "Dr. Surineni." (Yin, K)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/2022 GRANTING 41 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their opposition to 35 Motion to Amend on or before 10/25/2022.(Huang, H)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/29/2022 GRANTING 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to oppose Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint is EXTENDED to 10/11/2022. (Spichka, K.)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/29/2022 DENYING without prejudice 32 and 33 Motions. (Huang, H)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/22/2022 ADOPTING IN FULL 24 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice.(Perdue, C.)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/2022 ORDERING the Clerk to scan and docket plaintiff's July 11, 2022 complaint as a "Proposed Amended Complaint"; Return the summons, USM-285 form and original proposed amended complaint to plaintiff; and STRIKE the July 11, 2022 proposed amended complaint. (Yin, K)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/22 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to return to plaintiff the hard copy of his motion for summary judgment 22 and to assign a district judge to this case. RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 22 be denied without prejudice. F&R referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/28/2022. The assigned Deputy Attorney General shall contact the Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference in accordance with this order. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Yin, K)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/10/22 VACATING 15 , 16 plaintiff's motions. The Clerk of the Court shall return to plaintiff the original motions 15 and 16 . (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/2022 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Turner v. Ullery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?