(HC) Allen v. The People of the State of California
Petitioner: Anthony L. Allen, Jr.
Respondent: The People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2022cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Anthony L. Allen, Jr (Benson, A.)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 [DISREGARD - WRONG EVENT USED - NO IMAGE NOW ATTACHED ] CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.) Modified on 2/7/2022 (Benson, A.).
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Anthony L. Allen, Jr, CDC BN-8353 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony L. Allen, Jr. (Huang, H) Modified on 2/2/2022 (Plummer, M).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/20/2022 ORDERING petitioner to submit on the form provided by the Clerk a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Henshaw, R)
January 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on Anthony L. Allen Jr. (Henshaw, R)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
January 5, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony L. Allen Jr. (Coll, A)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against The People of the State of California by Anthony L. Allen, Jr. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Allen v. The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?