Brooke v. JSFS Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: JSFS Inc. Redding Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites
Case Number: 2:2022cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/3/2022: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement (ECF No. #7 ), the Court determined this case has settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before 2/28/2022. Accordingly, all other deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Theresa Brooke. Dispositional Docs due by 2/28/2022. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *JSFS Inc.* (Kaminski, H)
January 30, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JSFS Inc. by Theresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Strojnik, Peter)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: JSFS Inc. served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *JSFS Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *P. Kristofer Strojnik* *Law Offices of Peter K. Strojnik* *2415 E. Camelback Road, Suite 700* *Phoenix, Arizona 85016*. (Reader, L)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JSFS Inc. by Theresa Brooke. Attorney Strojnik, Peter Kristofer added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9996376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strojnik, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooke v. JSFS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSFS Inc. Redding Doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?