(PC)Beteta v. Gray
Plaintiff: Jose N. Beteta
Defendant: Gray
Case Number: 2:2022cv00037
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/2/2022 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jose N. Beteta. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/2/2022 GRANTING #5 and #8 Motions to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint; and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order and #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Jose N. Beteta. (Henshaw, R)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. by Jose N. Beteta. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jose N. Beteta (Kaminski, H)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jose N. Beteta, CDC F-07006 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose N. Beteta. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 1/20/2022 (Plummer, M).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/11/2022 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp application served on Jose N. Beteta. (Yin, K)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/6/2022*; Consent or Decline due by 2/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Reader, L)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jose N. Beteta. (Reader, L)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Dr. Gray by Jose N. Beteta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Beteta v. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose N. Beteta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?