Hogan et al v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M Hogan, Ru Hogan and Thomas M. Hogan
Defendant: Central Loan Administration and Reporting d/b/a Cenlar FSB, Citibank, Citibank NA, Citigroup, Central Loan Administration d/b/a Cenlar FSB and Cenlar FSB
Case Number: 2:2022cv00039
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cenlar FSB re #17 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Request for Judicial Notice, #19 Motion to Strike. (Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A).
March 1, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to STRIKE by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A).
March 1, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Cenlar FSB re #17 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A).
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to DISMISS by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A).
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by Citibank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodman, Helen) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/17/2022 SUBSTITUTING attorney John Steve Sargetis in place of attorney Thomas M. Hogan. (Huang, H)
February 16, 2022 Filing 14 WITHDRAWAL of #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cenlar FSB, #6 Motion to Strike, filed by Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coffield, Jessica)
February 16, 2022 Filing 13 WITHDRAWAL of #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Citibank NA. (Goodman, Helen)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas M. Hogan, Ru Hogan. Attorney Sargetis, John Steve added.(Sargetis, John)
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ru Hogan, Thomas M. Hogan. (Sargetis, John)
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Citibank NA. Motion Hearing SET for 3/7/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodman, Helen) Modified on 1/27/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cenlar FSB re #8 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint, #7 MOTION to DISMISS. (Coffield, Jessica)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Cenlar FSB re #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities , #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 1/27/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint, by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order , #2 Notice)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 1/27/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citibank NA of #2 New Case Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Looney, Helen) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Coll, A).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2022 GRANTING #3 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to respond by 1/26/2022. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER by Citibank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen C. Looney, #2 Proposed Order)(Looney, Helen) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Coll, A).
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2022 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-10002708 for $402.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Helen Looney. (Kastilahn, A)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0047363 by Ru Hogan, Thomas M Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen C. Looney, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Looney, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan et al v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M Hogan
Represented By: Thomas M. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ru Hogan
Represented By: Thomas M. Hogan
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Hogan
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Represented By: Thomas M. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Loan Administration and Reporting d/b/a Cenlar FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Represented By: Helen Looney
Represented By: Helen Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Loan Administration d/b/a Cenlar FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Jessica B. Coffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?