Diaz v. Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Grant Diaz
Defendant: Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00100
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY by Grant Diaz to response to #5 Motion to Remand. (Bokhour, Mehrdad) Modified on 3/16/2022 (Zignago, K.).
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2022: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/24/2022 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Plaintiff may still file a reply brief in accordance with Local Rule 230(d). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc. to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Haney, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Kyle)(Poper, Nicholas)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND by Grant Diaz. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bokhour, Mehrdad)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.. (Shadi, Sabrina)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sabrina Layne Shadi on behalf of Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.. Attorney Shadi, Sabrina Layne added. (Shadi, Sabrina)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS057518 by Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10028362) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Poper, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Diaz
Represented By: Mehrdad Bokhour
Represented By: Anwar Dillon-Thomas Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardagh Metal Beverage USA Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Represented By: Nicholas D. Poper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?