Cravotta v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Cravotta, II
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Scott Jones
Case Number: 2:2022cv00167
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY by County of Sacramento, Scott Jones, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Nathan, Jill)
March 11, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2022: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/24/2022 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Defendants may still file a reply brief in accordance with Local Rule 230(d) and the 3/24/2022 date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Anthony Cravotta, II to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Merin, Mark)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Sacramento, Scott Jones, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department. Attorney Nathan, Jill B. added. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Nathan, Jill)
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Scott Jones served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Merin, Mark)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Merin, Mark)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Merin, Mark)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/28/2022 GRANTING #2 Motion to Appoint ad Litem. The Court APPOINTS Anthony Cravotta as the guardian ad litem of Plaintiff Anthony Cravotta II. (Donati, J)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento, Scott Jones, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Anthony Cravotta, II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Cravotta, #2 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento, Scott Jones, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department by Anthony Cravotta, II. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10043214) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cravotta v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cravotta, II
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?