Herroz v. City of Manteca et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Herroz
Defendant: City of Manteca, Jason Massey, Ryan Castro, Mitchell Ellis and Javier Montanez
Case Number: 2:2022cv00245
Filed: February 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Claudia Leed on behalf of Ryan Castro, City of Manteca, Mitchell Ellis, Jason Massey, Javier Montanez. Attorney Leed, Claudia added. (Leed, Claudia)
March 15, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Ryan Castro on 2/8/2022, Answer due 4/11/2022 (Leone, Louis)
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Mitchell Ellis on 2/8/2022, Answer due 4/11/2022 (Leone, Louis)
March 15, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Javier Montanez on 2/8/2022, Answer due 4/11/2022 (Leone, Louis)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jason Massey on 2/8/2022, Answer due 4/11/2022 (Leone, Louis)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to City of Manteca on 2/8/2022, Answer due 4/11/2022 (Leone, Louis)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ryan Castro, City of Manteca, Mitchell Ellis, Jason Massey, Javier Montanez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kenneth Chike Odiwe* *7677 Oakport St* *Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Coll, A)
February 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Teresa Herroz (Odiwe, Kenneth)
February 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Teresa Herroz. Attorney Odiwe, Kenneth Chike added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10062925) (Odiwe, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herroz v. City of Manteca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Herroz
Represented By: Kenneth Chike Odiwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manteca
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Massey
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Castro
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Ellis
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Montanez
Represented By: Claudia Leed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?