(HC) Benson v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: Lance Alyn Benson
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2022cv00260
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from Southern District of California case number 3:22-cv-00323. (Gonzalez, R)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/8/2022 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Southern District of California. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
March 9, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Lance Alyn Benson. (Yin, K)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
February 10, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lance Alyn Benson. (Benson, A.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of California by Lance Alyn Benson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Benson v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lance Alyn Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?