(PC) Davis v. Saba et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Davis
Defendant: Saba, Manjeet and Ariua Singh
Case Number: 2:2022cv00269
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not in Custody: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Demetrius Davis. Notice of Change of Address due by 5/9/2022. (Rodriguez, E)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Maldonado, C)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00010.
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Demetrius Davis. (Maldonado, C)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This action is Transferred to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/2022. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive for mailing on 2/10/2022 [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of California (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Demetrius Davis. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Demetrius Davis. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Saba, Manjeet, Ariua Singh (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Demetrius Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/11/2022. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 2/10/2022. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Letter dated 12/14/2021 from Demetrius Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) [Transferred from cand on 2/11/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Davis v. Saba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjeet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariua Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?