(PS) Nelson v. Shasta County Courts et al
Plaintiff: Fontella Franscine Nelson
Defendant: Shasta County Courts, Shon Michaels Northam, Gregory S. Gaul, Adam B. Ryan, Michael Pallares and John A. Mendez
Case Number: 2:2022cv00347
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/19/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing within 14 days why her failure to file an amended complaint should not result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Rodriguez, E)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Fontella Franscine Nelson. (Rodriguez, E)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/14/2022 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that names defendants who are amenable to suit, and which complies with the instructions given. If plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, the undersigned may recommend that this action be dismissed. (Reader, L)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Fontella Franscine Nelson. (Reader, L)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/2022: District Judge John A. Mendez recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:22-CV-347 TLN AC (PS).(Reader, L)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order of Recusal served on Fontella Franscine Nelson. (Reader, L)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Huang, H)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fontella Franscine Nelson. (Huang, H)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Fontella Franscine Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Nelson v. Shasta County Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fontella Franscine Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shon Michaels Northam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Gaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?