Sare, v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Natalie P. Sare
Defendant: Tesla, Inc. and Tesla Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00547
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY by Natalie P. Sare re #9 Opposition to Motion,, #8 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Proof of Service)(Van Fleet, Matthew)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/05/2022 EXTENDING time to file a Joint Status Report no later than 07/01/2022 after the Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Rodriguez, E)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file a Joint Status Report by Tesla, Inc. (Preciado, Michael)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Tesla, Inc. to #8 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A (Notice of Removal), #3 Exhibit B (Form 8-K), #4 Exhibit C (Gigafactory Texas), #5 Exhibit D (Elon Musk CEO), #6 Exhibit E (Article Confirming Move to Texas), #7 Exhibit F (Corporate Governance Guidelines), #8 Exhibit G (Article Headquarters Move), #9 Exhibit H (Travis County Report), #10 Exhibit I (Certificate of Compliance), #11 Exhibit J (Form 10-K))(Preciado, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2022 (Kaminski, H).
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND by Natalie P. Sare. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Van Fleet , #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Van Fleet, Matthew) Modified on 4/21/2022 (Benson, A.).
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BRENT D. RAWLINGS by Natalie P. Sare. (Michaels, Jonathan)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Michaels, Jonathan)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Michael A. Preciado re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Preciado, Michael)
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kathie Craig re Certificate of Service. (Preciado, Michael)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Preciado, Michael)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UPL-2022-0001113 by Tesla, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10141379) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Preciado, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Notice of Related Cases)(Preciado, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sare, v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie P. Sare
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Represented By: Brent Rawlings
Represented By: Matthew Van Fleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alan Preciado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?