(HC) Springfield v. Burton
Petitioner: Ciron B. Springfield
Respondent: Robert Burton
Case Number: 2:2022cv00568
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/18/22 DIRECTING Petitioner to submit a completed IFP application or pay the appropriate filing fee.(Licea Chavez, V)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on Ciron B. Springfield. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Perdue, C.)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Perdue, Christina)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ciron B. Springfield. (Perdue, Christina)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Robert Burton by Ciron B. Springfield.(Perdue, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Springfield v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ciron B. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?