Aghanazari et al v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Mohammad Aghanazari and Kevan Daryabeghi Moghadam
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co. and American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00630
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by Southwest Airlines Co. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Martorano, Rebekka) Modified on 5/19/2022 (Coll, A).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 05/06/2022 ORDERING Southwest's time for filing an answer shall be EXTENDED until 14 days after the Court issues its ruling regarding Southwest's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or to such other time as shall be determined by the Court. (Rodriguez, E)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Time for Filing Answer by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Martorano, Rebekka)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/5/2022: Pursuant to the filing of the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. #7 ), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #4 ) is hereby DENIED as MOOT. Accordingly, the 5/19/2022 hearing date is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Mohammad Aghanazari, Kevan Daryabeghi Moghadam to #4 Motion to Dismiss,. (Zal, Cyrus)
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Co., American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. by Mohammad Aghanazari, Kevan Daryabeghi Moghadam.(Zal, Cyrus)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mohammad Aghanazari, Kevan Daryabeghi Moghadam (Zal, Cyrus)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Martorano, Rebekka)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Southwest Airlines Co.. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Martorano, Rebekka) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE #1 Notice of Removal by Southwest Airlines Co. (Martorano, Rebekka) Modified on 4/11/2022 (Benson, A.).
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2022 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-10166104 for $ 402.00 for filing fee from Martorano, Rebekka. (Kaminski, H)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00307399 by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebekka R. Martorano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B , #4 Exhibit C , #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F , #8 Exhibit G #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martorano, Rebekka)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aghanazari et al v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Aghanazari
Represented By: Cyrus Zal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevan Daryabeghi Moghadam
Represented By: Cyrus Zal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Rebekka Martorano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?