(HC) Paisano v. Pallares
Petitioner: Norma Paisano
Respondent: Michael Pallares
Case Number: 2:2022cv00641
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Norma Paisano.(Spolin, Aaron)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/16/22 DISMISSING petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus with leave to file an amended petition within 14 days; and GRANTING #3 Motion to Stay. Upon filing of the amended petition, this matter will be stayed until petitioner exhausts state court remedies with respect to claims 4 and 5. (Plummer, M)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Spolin, Aaron)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to STAY by Norma Paisano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spolin, Aaron) Modified on 4/11/2022 (Plummer, M).
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Norma Paisano (Spolin, Aaron)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Michael Pallares by Norma Paisano. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-10169778) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spolin, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Paisano v. Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norma Paisano
Represented By: Aaron Spolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?