Attia v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Sameh H. Attia
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00648
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 24 JUDGMENT dated *11/7/2023* pursuant to order signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2023 in favor of Plaintiff. (Clemente Licea, O)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2023 ENTERING judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $181,220.40 pursuant to the terms of the rule 68 offer. CASE CLOSED. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 26, 2023 Filing 22 REQUEST for ENTRY of JUDGMENT by Sameh H. Attia. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 10/27/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/9/2023 CONTINUING Fact Discovery cut-off deadline to 10/27/2023. Last date to hear Dispositive Motions by 1/26/2024. Expert Discovery by 12/8/2023. Expert Disclosure due by 11/10/2023, and Rebuttal Expert Disclosure by 11/24/2023.(Reader, L)
July 28, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuing trial and related deadlines by Sameh H. Attia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Larocque, #2 Proposed Order)(LaRocque, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/1/2023 (Kastilahn, A).
July 17, 2023 Filing 19 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Ariel Harman-Holmes by All Plaintiffs by Sameh H. Attia. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/18/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Sameh H. Attia. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/30/23 CONTINUING the following dates: Fact discovery cutoff: 07/28/23; Initial expert disclosures due 08/11/23 with any Rebuttal expert disclosures due 08/25/23 and Expert Discovery cutoff 09/08/23; last day to hear dispositive motions: 10/13/23. (Benson, A.)
March 21, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Discovery Deadlines by Sameh H. Attia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 3/22/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 26, 2022 Filing 15 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/26/2022. (Schultz, C)
August 26, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTES for SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held (via videoconference) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/26/2022, and FRCP 16 BENCH ORDER: Plaintiff's Counsel, Ariel Harman-Holmes, present. Defendant's Counsel, Jeanette Suarez, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, the court ORDERED the following pre-trial case schedule: joinder of parties or amendments shall be permitted with stipulation or leave of court for good cause shown; Initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) shall be completed by 9/15/2022; fact discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2023; expert disclosures shall be completed by 4/7/2023; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 4/21/2023; all expert discovery shall be completed by 5/5/2023; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 6/2/2023. Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the parties will notify the court whether they request a court settlement conference date or referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP") prior to any final pretrial conference. The parties shall file said notification or request for referral jointly, in writing. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's standing scheduling order for Civil Cases filed concurrently herewith are incorporated therein. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/24/2022: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/25/2022 will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. Accordingly, the 8/19/2022 Request for Telephonic Appearance, ECF No. #11 , is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nejla Nassirian on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Nassirian, Nejla added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nassirian, Nejla)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 8/25/2022 Scheduling Conference hearing re #10 Scheduling Report filed by Sameh H. Attia by Sameh H. Attia. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 11, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Sameh H. Attia. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Hugret, Spencer Peter added.(Hugret, Spencer)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US, LLC served on 7/6/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Sameh H. Attia. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, APC* *1888 Century Park East, Floor 19* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sameh H. Attia (Dolin, Tionna)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Sameh H. Attia. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10171253) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Dodge Charger Express Warranty)(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attia v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sameh H. Attia
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?