(PC) Bacha v. Chavez et al
Plaintiff: Sammy Bacha
Defendant: Chavez, Lamott, Martin, Frietas, John Doe and Delores Johnson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00652
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200120916 $402.00 fbo Sammy Bacha by State of California on 5/16/2022. (Coll, A)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #7 Order by Sammy Bacha. (Zignago, K.)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/25/2022 DENYING #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Perdue, C.)
April 25, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Sammy Bacha. (Perdue, C.)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Sammy Bacha. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Sammy Bacha. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/22 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either a completed application to proceed IFP or the required fees. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP served on Sammy Bacha. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/12/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Perdue, C.)
April 13, 2022 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sammy Bacha. (Perdue, C.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Chavez, John Doe (Counselor), John Doe (Corrections Officer Control Door), John Doe (Inmate), Frietas, Delores Johnson, Lamott, Martin by Sammy Bacha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perdue, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bacha v. Chavez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Bacha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frietas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?