(SS) Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Eric E. Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2022cv00697
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE: In accordance with the Social Security Scheduling Order in effect for cases filed on or after June 15, 2021, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security hereby acknowledges electronic service of the complaint through the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel's designated email address on 6/1/2022. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Social Security Admin- SS E-Service, )
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Brixie, Peter)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) [ Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Rodriguez, E)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *90* days. Attorney *Peter Brixie* *Law Office of Peter Brixie* *410 12th Street, Suite 1* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Rodriguez, E)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 04/25/2022 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING E-Service on the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk shall issue a summons and serve this order, summons, new case documents and complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Rodriguez, E)
April 22, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rodriguez, E)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eric E Martinez. (Brixie, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Eric E Martinez (Brixie, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Eric E Martinez.(Brixie, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric E. Martinez
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?