Nelson et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Katherine Nelson, The Estates of Raymond Albert McDaniel and Maggie Lou McDaniel, Gary McDaniel and Donna Giltner
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00741
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/6/2022. GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Kyle W. LeClere, PHV for Whirlpool Corporation. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Perdue, C.)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Whirlpool Corporation. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10218320) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Haddad, Georges)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Whirlpool Corporation. (Haddad, Georges)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Whirlpool Corporation.(Haddad, Georges)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS057775 by Whirlpool Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10206869) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing in Superior Court, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Haddad, Georges)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Nelson
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estates of Raymond Albert McDaniel and Maggie Lou McDaniel
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary McDaniel
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Giltner
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Georges Andrew Haddad
Represented By: Kyle W. LeClere, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?