Dalton et al v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: Connor Dalton and Anthony Samano
Defendant: Forrest C. Freeman, Craig Freeman, Alerus Financial, N.A., Carla Freeman, Larry L. Wray, Reginal D. Wright, Rick Wylie, Don Yee, O.C. Communications, Inc. and TAK Communications CA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00847
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant O.C. Communications, Inc.. (Williams, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #2 Summons, #1 Complaint by O.C. Communications, Inc.. Attorney Williams, Jennifer Lynn added. (Williams, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Alerus Financial, N.A. for attorney Shaun Gates to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10330687) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fedder, Natasha)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/14/2022 GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Samuel Levin, to appear for Alerus Financial, N.A. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Alerus Financial, N.A. on 6/10/2022, Answer due 8/9/2022 (Kim, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Carla Freeman served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Kim, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Forrest C. Freeman served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Kim, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TAK Communications CA, Inc. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Kim, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Alerus Financial, N.A. for attorney Samuel Levin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10327696) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fedder, Natasha)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Alerus Financial, N.A.. (Fedder, Natasha)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Natasha Fedder on behalf of Alerus Financial, N.A.. Attorney Fedder, Natasha added. (Fedder, Natasha)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/6/2022 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to 7/29/2022. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by TAK Communications CA, Inc., Larry L. Wray. Attorney Thomas, Dominique N added. (Thomas, Dominique) Modified on 6/28/2022 (Benson, A.).
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alerus Financial, N.A., Carla Freeman, Forrest C. Freeman, O.C. Communications, Inc., TAK Communications CA, Inc., Larry L. Wray, Reginal D. Wright, Rick Wylie, Don Yee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jason H. Kim* *Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP* *2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400* *Emeryville, CA 94608*. (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Anthony Samano, Connor Dalton. Attorney Kim, Jason added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10238182) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton et al v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest C. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alerus Financial, N.A.
Represented By: Natasha Fedder
Represented By: Samuel Levin, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L. Wray
Represented By: Dominique N Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginal D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.C. Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAK Communications CA, Inc.
Represented By: Dominique N Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Dalton
Represented By: Jason Kim
Represented By: James Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Samano
Represented By: Jason Kim
Represented By: James Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?