(PS) Wooten v. The State of California et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wooten
Defendant: The State of California and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 2:2022cv00850
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/6/2022 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Referred to Judge Troy L Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Perdue, C.)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Findings and Recommendations served on Robert Wooten. (Perdue, C.)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/03/2022 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP. No later than 06/20/2022, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Rodriguez, E)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Robert Wooten. (Rodriguez, E)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Kastilahn, A)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Wooten. (Kastilahn, A)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robert Wooten. (Kastilahn, A)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Emergency Relief Request) against All Defendants by Robert Wooten.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Wooten v. The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?