(CONSENT) Presba et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Presba and Kris Presba
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01241
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/22 ORDERING that the parties shall exchange initial disclosures no later than 9/12/22, if they haven't already done so. All non-expert discovery shall be completed by 2/10/23. The parties shall disclose any expert witnesses no later than 2/24/23, for plaintiffs' expert disclosures and 3/24/23, for defendants' disclosures. Any rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made no later than 4/21/23. All expert discovery shall be completed by 7/28/23. All law and motion, except as to discovery-related matters, shall be completed by 9/26/23. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 10/24/23 at 09:00 AM and the Jury Trial is SET for 11/22/23 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kastilahn, A)
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/11/2022: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:22-cv-1241-KJN.(Coll, A)
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Deitchman, William)
August 5, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) by Judicial Assistant D. Eichhorn. On July 14, 2022, defendant removed this case from state court, and this court assigned the case solely to the undersigned under Appendix A of the court's local rules. (ECF No. 1.) The initial scheduling order required each party to return the "Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction" form to the Clerk within 14 days of removal from state court. (ECF No. 3 at par. 2.) A review of the docket indicates that only one consent/decline form has been submitted. As noted on the consent/decline documents issued by the Clerk, the parties are not required to consent, but the parties' designations are required in order for the court to properly process any forthcoming issues (including, for example, a motion to remand or case scheduling order). Thus, any party who has not submitted its consent/decline designation shall do so within five days of this order. Failure to submit a consent/decline designation will result in future delays in this case.(Eichhorn, D)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior Court, case number 22CV0687 by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10328056) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Interested Parties)(Tolson, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (CONSENT) Presba et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Presba
Represented By: William A Deitchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Presba
Represented By: William A Deitchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Zachary S. Tolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?