(SS) Aronson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Elias Aronson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2022cv01267
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/1/2022: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:22-cv-1267-DMC.(Zignago, K.)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lambert, Meghan)
August 15, 2022 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Caspar Chan for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Chan, Caspar)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Chan, Caspar)
July 30, 2022 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE: In accordance with the Social Security Scheduling Order in effect for cases filed on or after June 15, 2021, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security hereby acknowledges electronic service of the complaint through the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel's designated email address on 7/30/2022. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Social Security Admin- SS E-Service, )
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Kastilahn, A)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *90* days. Attorney *Meghan O. Lambert* *Osterhout Berger Disability Law* *521 Cedar Way, Suite 200* *Oakmont, PA 15139*. (Kastilahn, A)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by David Elias Aronson. Attorney Lambert, Meghan O. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10332676) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambert, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Aronson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elias Aronson
Represented By: Meghan O. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Caspar Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?