(PC) McClain v. Scottini
Plaintiff: Jason McClain
Defendant: C/O D. Scottini and D. Scottini
Case Number: 2:2022cv01631
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/07/22 DENYING #16 Motion for leave to Amend. (Woodworth, M.)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order served on Jason McClain. (Woodworth, M.)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE by defendant(s) Daniel Scottini. AG Waiver of Service due in 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to AMEND the Complaint by Jason McClain. (Reader, L)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis served on Director of CDCR per #14 Order. (Huang, H)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jason McClain signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/7/2022. CDCR is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Huang, H)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/7/2022. Consent or Decline due by 11/10/2022. (Huang, H)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *D. Scottini* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jason McClain, AR-4191* *California State Prison, Lancaster* *PO Box 4670* *Lancaster, CA 93539*. (Huang, H)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/7/2022 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, ORDERING that Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action, and FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant: *D. Scottini*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Huang, H)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and #14 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Jason McClain. (Huang, H)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-1631 WBS CKD. (Spichka, K.)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jason McClain. (Spichka, K.)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Spichka, K.)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jason McClain. (Zignago, K.)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jason McClain, CDCR No. AR-4191, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Huang, H)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lundstrom, T)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:22-cv-05238.
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jason McClain. (Lundstrom, T)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/15/2022. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/16/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/16/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason McClain. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022) [Transferred from cand on 9/16/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. Scottini. Filed byJason McClain. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022) [Transferred from cand on 9/16/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) McClain v. Scottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O D. Scottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?