Republican National Committee v. Google Inc
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01904
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Google Inc. for attorney Ryan Spear to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10601191) (Bali, Sunita)
December 15, 2022 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Google Inc. for attorney Michael R. Huston to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10601170) (Bali, Sunita)
December 15, 2022 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Google Inc. for attorney Abdul Kallon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10601123) (Bali, Sunita)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/02/22 EXTENDING the deadline to Respond to Complaint as follows: Defendant's response to the Complaint due: 1/23/23; Plaintiff's opposition brief, if any, due: 02/06/23 and Defendant's reply brief, if any, due: 02/16/23. (Benson, A.) Modified on 12/9/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Google Inc.. Attorney Bali, Sunita added. (Bali, Sunita)
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Google Inc.. (Bali, Sunita)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Republican National Committee for attorney Conor D. Woodfin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10573526) (Graham, Jeremiah)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Republican National Committee for attorney Thomas Samuel Vaseliou to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10573515) (Graham, Jeremiah)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Republican National Committee for attorney Thomas Ryan McCarthy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10573500) (Graham, Jeremiah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Perdue, C.)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-1904 TLN JDP. (Perdue, C.)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Graham, Jeremiah)
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Google Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremiah Graham* *Dhillon Law Group Inc.* *177 Post St Ste 700* *San Francisco, CA 94108*. (Licea Chavez, V)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeremiah Graham on behalf of Republican National Committee. Attorney Graham, Jeremiah added. (Graham, Jeremiah)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Republican National Committee (Dhillon, Harmeet)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc by Republican National Committee. Attorney Dhillon, Harmeet Kaur added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10509403) (Dhillon, Harmeet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republican National Committee v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Jeremiah Graham
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?