(PS) Warfield v. McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper et al
Plaintiff: Broderick James Warfield
Defendant: McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper and Jess Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2022cv01951
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/18/2022 WITHDRAWING the #3 Order and Findings and Recommendations and RECOMMENDING that the claims asserted under 42 U.S.C. 1983, Title 18, and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 be dismissed with prejudice, that any state law claim for defamation or libel against defendants be dismissed without prejudice and that the clerk close this case. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Spichka, K.)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Broderick James Warfield. (Spichka, K.)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Injunction against McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper, Jess Sullivan by Broderick James Warfield.(Reader, L)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [WITHDRAWN pursuant to #5 Order] ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/07/2022 GRANTING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that the claims under 42 U.S.C. 1983, 18 U.S.C. 1503, and 28 U.S.C. 4101 be dismissed with prejudice, that any state law claim for defamation or libel against defendants be dismissed without prejudice and that the clerk close this case. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Spichka, K.) Modified on 11/9/2022 (Spichka, K.). Modified on 11/21/2022 (Spichka, K.).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Broderick James Warfield. (Spichka, K.)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Perdue, C.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Broderick James Warfield. (Perdue, C.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper, Jess Sullivan by Broderick James Warfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perdue, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Warfield v. McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broderick James Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNaughton Daily Republic Newspaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?