(SS) Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Francisco J. Ramirez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2022cv01987
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:22-CV-1987-WBS-DMC. (Rodriguez, E)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sackett, Harvey)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Kaminski, H)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Harvey Peter Sackett* *Sackett & Associates, A Professional Law Corporation* *1055 Lincoln Ave.* *San Jose, CA 95125*. (Kaminski, H)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/22/22 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue a summons. Clerk of the Court shall deliver to the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney's Office the summons and complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on Plaintiff scheduling order in social security cases. (Kaminski, H)
November 3, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Perdue, C.)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Francisco J. Ramirez. (Sackett, Harvey)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Francisco J. Ramirez. Attorney Sackett, Harvey Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco J. Ramirez
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?