Mosley v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suzette Mosley
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Roseville
Case Number: 2:2022cv02110
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Ariel Harman-Holmes by All Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/18/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Suzette Mosley. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 5/16/2023 ORDERING that all fact Discovery shall be completed by 3/18/2024. The parties shall disclose initial experts and produce reports by no later than 4/8/2024. With regard to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced on or before 4/22/2024. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 5/24/2024. By 10/27/2023, all parties shall file with the Court a brief Joint Mid-Discovery Statement summarizing the current status of discovery proceedings. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 8/16/2024 and shall be noticed for hearing before Judge Calabretta on 10/3/2024 at 1:30 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/16/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. A Jury Trial is SET for 3/17/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 4/5/2023: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/6/2023, before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED. The Court will rely on the parties' #9 Joint Scheduling Report and will reset the hearing before Judge Calabretta if it subsequently concludes that appearances are necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cc: KJM) [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller* to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta for all further proceedings. All pending motions are submitted without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) and the hearing on said motions is VACATED. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. Further, all pretrial conference and trial dates currently set in this reassigned action are VACATED and shall be reset, as necessary, by the reassigned Court. (Donati, J)
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Suzette Mosley. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 24, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric)
February 23, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/23/2023: Due to a scheduling conflict and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/13/2023 is ADVANCED to 4/6/2023 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. The April hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on Defendant not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Hanna, Timothy Alexander added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hanna, Timothy)
November 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Hugret, Spencer Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric Tsai on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0049022 by FCA US, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10564294) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of ET, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Mosley
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Timothy Alexander Hanna
Represented By: Eric Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Roseville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?