Dirkzwager v. Costco Wholesale Corp.
Plaintiff: Marian Dirkzwager
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv02215
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Jaime, Matthew)
January 12, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
January 12, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-2215-TLN-CKD. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation re #2 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Jaime, Matthew)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jaime, Matthew)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/2023: The court's records show that all parties have yet to submit the Consent/Decline designation regarding the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge for all purposes, including the entry of final judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). See ECF No. #2 (Initial Scheduling Order, requesting parties' designation regarding consent within 14 days of removal from state court). Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), the parties are under no obligation to consent and a party's response is kept confidential. However, a Consent/Decline designation assists the court in determining how the action will be administratively processed. Accordingly, within 14 (fourteen) days of this order, any party who has yet to submit the Consent/Decline form shall do so. See ECF No. 2-1 (Consent/Decline Form). (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L)
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
December 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00320948 by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10596577) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal)(Jaime, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dirkzwager v. Costco Wholesale Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Dirkzwager
Represented By: Charles D. Caraway
Represented By: Daniel Ramon Del Rio
Represented By: Matthew Dean Engebretson
Represented By: Charles D. Caraway, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Charles Jaime
Represented By: Robert W. Sweetin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?