(PS) Valentine v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deshayla Valentine
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv02238
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/6/2023 VACATING #7 Motion to Dismiss. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition; if plaintiff no longer wishes to prosecute this case, then plaintiff may file a notice of voluntary dismissal. (Perdue, C.)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Deshayla Valentine. (Perdue, C.)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPLY by Social Security Administration re #7 Motion to Dismiss,. (Scarborough, Philip)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS by Social Security Administration. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proof of Service)(Scarborough, Philip) Modified on 1/5/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Scarborough, Philip)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of service of initial scheduling order by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Scarborough, Philip) Modified on 12/21/2022 (Reader, L).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Social Security Administration re #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Scarborough, Philip)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Social Security Administration. (Scarborough, Philip)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS059211 by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarborough, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Valentine v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshayla Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Philip A. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?