Parella v. Atamian, et al.,
Debtor: Dickran H. Atamian, Price Group, Inc., Price Rubin & Partners and North American Artists Foundation Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Marc Parella
Case Number: 2:2022mc00229
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/2022 DIRECTING that Parella must comply with Local Rule 230(b) as to #3 Proposed Order and notice a motion or ex parte motion for a hearing before the undersigned; in any such motion, Parella shall address this court's jurisdiction to change the name of the judgment debtor. (Perdue, C.)
August 23, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by Marc Parella. (Whiteford, Kevin)
August 23, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Identity Regarding Judgment Debtor Dickran H. Atamian, #2 Points and Authorities)(Whiteford, Kevin) Modified on 8/23/2022 (Benson, A.).
August 23, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Marc Parella. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin P. Whiteford Re:Accrued Interest)(Whiteford, Kevin) Modified on 8/23/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 25, 2022 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Registration of Foreign Judgment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of FOREIGN JUDGMENT by Marc Parella. Attorney Serlin, Mark A. added. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Final Judgment) (Filing fee $49, Receipt Number ACAEDC-10341510 )(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 7/25/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parella v. Atamian, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Dickran H. Atamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Price Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Price Rubin & Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: North American Artists Foundation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Marc Parella
Represented By: Kevin P. Whiteford
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?