City of Sacramento et al v. McKinsey and Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento and People of the State of California
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00141
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from California Northern District case number 3:23-cv-01062. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Electronic Transfer Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey and Company, Inc. by City of Sacramento, People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sklaver, Steven)
January 24, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by McKinsey & Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 New Case Documents. (Cohen, Joshua) Modified on 1/25/2023 (Benson, A.).
January 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.)
January 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00331717 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10657995) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Claim No. 150250, #4 Exhibit 4 - County of Sacramento v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sacramento et al v. McKinsey and Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Alan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Represented By: Joshua Alan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: Joshua Alan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?