Patterson v. Sazerac Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Damien Patterson
Defendant: Sazerac Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00150
Filed: January 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to ECF No. #12 , the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case without prejudice. Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss #9 is DENIED as MOOT. (Deutsch, S)
March 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Damien Patterson. (Gavenman, Jenna)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 4/20/2023 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #9 is VACATED and the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c)-(d). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. (Deutsch, S)
March 9, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sazerac Company, Inc. re #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Schmidt, Kent)
March 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Sazerac Company, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dara Hang, #2 Declaration of Jackie Wheeler, #3 Declaration of Ryan Richardson, #4 Declaration of Habiba Sherali, for Sherali Grocery Company, #5 Declaration of Kent J. Schmidt, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Certificate of Service of Declaration of Kent J. Schmid)(Schmidt, Kent) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 27, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT STATEMENT of Case Identification filed by Plaintiff Damien Patterson. (Deckant, Neal)
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jenna Louise Gavenman on behalf of Damien Patterson. Attorney Gavenman, Jenna Louise added. (Gavenman, Jenna)
February 15, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION for 28 DAY EXTENSION of TIME to Respond to #1 Complaint by Sazerac Company, Inc. (Schmidt, Kent) Modified on 2/16/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sazerac Company, Inc.. Attorney Schmidt, Kent J. added. (Schmidt, Kent)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sazerac Company, Inc. served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Deckant, Neal)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Perdue, C.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sazerac Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal J. Deckant* *Bursor & Fisher, P.A.* *1990 N. California Blvd. Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3745*. (Perdue, C.)
January 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sazerac Company, Inc. by Damien Patterson. Attorney Deckant, Neal J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10661404) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deckant, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Sazerac Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Patterson
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Jenna Louise Gavenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sazerac Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kent J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?