(PC) Brooks v. Cassie
Case Number: 2:2023cv00294
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/05/2024 GRANTING 34 Motion for Extension of Time. Motions to Compel due by 07/05/2024. (Murphy, J)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/20/2024 DIRECTING the clerk to randomly assign a District Judge to this action. Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peter son for all further proceedings. It is further RECOMMENDED the 25 Motion to Strike be granted as to defendant's Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Affirmative Defenses, which are stricken with leave to amend and be denied as to defendant's First and Eighth Affirmative Defenses.Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. New Case Number: 2:23-cv-0294 KJM JDP (PC). (Kyono, V)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 03/06/2024 GRANTING 27 , 28 , & 30 Motions for Extension of Time and DEEMING 29 Opposition timely. Defendant is GRANTED until 04/03/2024, to respond to plaintiff's discovery request. Plaintiff to file his Reply to 29 Opposition by 04/03/2024. (Murphy, J)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/01/2023 GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading no later than 11/27/2023. (Lopez, K)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/6/2023 GRANTING 17 Motion to Opt Out of Post-Screening ADR Project. The stay of this action is LIFTED. Within 21 days from the date of this order, Defendant shall file a responsive pleading. (Huang, H)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/07/2023 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. Within 60 days from the date of this order, Defendants shall file any motion to opt out of the Post-Screening ADR Project. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Spichka, K.)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 05/02/2023 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of William Lee Brooks, II. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis application on CDCR. (cc: Financial, CDCR) (Spichka, K.)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/17/2023 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit IFP application or required filing fee of $402 within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Brooks v. Cassie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?