(HC) Hawkins v. Santoro
Petitioner: Kenneth Hawkins
Respondent: Kelly Santoro
Case Number: 2:2023cv00641
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Vij, M)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kenneth Hawkins at CHCF. (Huang, H)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:22-cv-09148.
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kenneth Hawkins. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/3/2023. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/6/2023. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00.). Filed byKenneth Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 4/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Hawkins v. Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?