(PC) George v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Louis George, Jr.
Defendant: A. Lopez, C. Lor, Eniola Oguntuase, CO Chang, C. Astorga, D. Howard, A. Orozco, M. Khan and Chang
Case Number: 2:2023cv00844
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Louis George, Jr to #10 Order. (Clemente Licea, O)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 05/26/2023 DIRECTING Plaintiff to respond to this order, within 21 days, and explain why he should still be allowed to proceed IFP. (Spichka, K.)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Louis George Jr. (Spichka, K.)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Louis George, Jr (Clemente Licea, O)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Louis George, Jr, CDCR No. E-82941, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Huang, H)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-0844 WBS JDP. (Benson, A.)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Louis George Jr.. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Louis George, Jr. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Louis George, Jr.(Benson, A.)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/9/2023 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp, or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp application served on Louis George Jr. (Yin, K)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/5/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Benson, A.)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Louis George Jr. (Benson, A.)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Louis George, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) George v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis George, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eniola Oguntuase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Astorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?