(PC) Mathews v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: James Lee Mathews
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff and UC Davis Medical
Case Number: 2:2023cv00922
Filed: May 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of BEING DENIED medical, psych, and ADA accommodations records by James Lee Mathews (Clemente Licea, O)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 146 Angel Way, Rio Linda, CA 95673 by James Lee Mathews. (Clemente Licea, O)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Lee Mathews. (Lopez, K)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all defendants by James Lee Mathews.(Lopez, K)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Perdue, C.)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Lee Mathews. (Perdue, C.)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Lee Mathews. (Perdue, C.)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff, UC Davis Medical by James Lee Mathews. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Perdue, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Mathews v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UC Davis Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?