Devi v. Sunrise Senior Living, LLC
Plaintiff: Morine Devi
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00978
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 06/27/23 DISMISSING Plaintiff's class and individual claims; STAYING all proceedings and deadlines pending the CA Supreme Court's decision in Adolph v. Uber Technologies, Inc.; Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed 30 days after the CA Supreme Court's decision. (Benson, A.)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Class And Individual Claims And Stay Proceedings by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maryott, Michele)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the Complaint by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC. (Maryott, Michele)
May 25, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for DJC. (Maryott, Michele)
May 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of FILING Notice of Removal by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Maryott, Michele) Modified on 5/25/2023 (Benson, A.).
May 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S): USDC Central District cases: 2:21-cv-00748-JAK (PLAx), 8:19-cv-00443 JAK (PLAx), 2:20-cv-06300-JAK (PLAx), 8:19-cv-01554-JAK (PLAx), 2:13-cv-06294-GW-MAN, 2:13-cv-02171-JAK-PLA, 8:10-cv-897- JAK-MLG by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC. (Maryott, Michele) Modified on 5/25/2023 (Benson, A.).
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
May 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2023-00336258-CU-OE-GDS by Sunrise Senior Living, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10874619) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Wendy Sekel, #3 Declaration of Jessica Pearigen, #4 Exhibit A , #5 Exhibit B , #6 Exhibit C , #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #13 Proof of Service)(Maryott, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devi v. Sunrise Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morine Devi
Represented By: James Ross Hawkins
Represented By: Christina M. Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living, LLC
Represented By: Michele Leigh Maryott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?