(PC) Duclos v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: McGhee Tony Duclos
Defendant: Jeff Lynch, J. Gregory, T. Cameron, T. Drake, Steve Molina and K. Franceschi
Case Number: 2:2023cv01000
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff McGhee Tony Duclos re #7 Motion for IFP. (Lopez, K)
July 14, 2023 Filing 13 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #7 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR pursuant to #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Spichka, K.)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 07/14/2023 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of McGhee Tony Duclos. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis application on CDCR. (cc: Financial, CDCR) (Spichka, K.)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 07/14/2023 GRANTING the #7 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Spichka, K.)
July 14, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order and #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on McGhee Tony Duclos. (Spichka, K.)
July 5, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR STATUS by McGhee Tony Duclos. (Clemente Licea, O) [Response sent: Motion to Proceed IFP and Consent/Decline received on 7/5/23. The Court requires the original plus one copy of most pleadings.] Modified on 7/11/2023 (Spichka, K.).
July 5, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff McGhee Tony Duclos re: #6 Order, #7 Motion for IFP, and #8 Consent/Decline (Woodson, A)
July 5, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS to #6 Order by McGhee Tony Duclos. (Woodson, A)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/29/2023 GRANTING the #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall resolve the fee status for this case within 30 days of the date of this order. (Spichka, K.)
June 29, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on McGhee Tony Duclos. (Spichka, K.)
June 26, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP re #4 Order by McGhee Tony Duclos. (Lopez, K)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/30/2023 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP or pay the appropriate filing fee within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
May 31, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on McGhee Tony Duclos. (Spichka, K.)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 6/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lawrence, A)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/26/2023. New Case Number 2:23-cv-01000-DMC (PC). Old Case Number 1:23-cv-00804-EPG (PC). (Lawrence, A)
May 26, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order served on McGhee Tony Duclos. (Lawrence, A)
May 25, 2023 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against T. Cameron, T. Drake, K. Franceschi, J. Gregory, Jeff Lynch, Steve Molina by McGhee Tony Duclos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lawrence, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Duclos v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McGhee Tony Duclos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Franceschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?