(PC) Lewis v. Harrod et al
Plaintiff: Brian Dion Lewis
Defendant: M. Harrod and J. Speers
Case Number: 2:2023cv01221
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Brian Dion Lewis. (Lopez, K)
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Brian Dion Lewis. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/25/2023 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. (Huang, H)
July 25, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Brian Dion Lewis. (Huang, H)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP by Brian Dion Lewis. (Lopez, K)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/29/2023 DENYING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a completed Motion for IFP within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
June 30, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Brian Dion Lewis. (Spichka, K.)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lopez, K)
June 26, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Brian Dion Lewis. (Lopez, K)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Brian Dion Lewis. (Lopez, K)
June 22, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Harrod, J. Speers by M. Harrod.(Lopez, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lewis v. Harrod et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dion Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Speers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?