(PC) Kalaaukahi v. Salinas Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: James Kalaaukahi
Defendant: Y. Salinas Gonzalez, H. Ortiz, B. Dower, B. Williams, B. Jones and D. Crosby
Case Number: 2:2023cv01268
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 08/25/2023. Consent or Decline due by 9/28/2023. (Spichka, K.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *D. Crosby, B. Dower, B. Jones, H. Ortiz, Y. Salinas Gonzalez, B. Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Kalaaukahi #BM-3150* *Kern Valley State Prison* *P.O. Box 5103* *Delano, CA 93216*. (Spichka, K.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 11 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR pursuant to #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Spichka, K.)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 08/25/2023 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Kalaaukahi. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis application on CDCR. (cc: Financial, CDCR) (Spichka, K.)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 08/24/2023 GRANTING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *Y. Salinas Gonzalez*, *H. Ortiz*,*B. Dower*,*B. Williams*, *B. Jones*, *D. Crosby*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order to be served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Waiver) (Spichka, K.)
August 25, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate and #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on James Kalaaukahi. (Spichka, K.)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Kalaaukahi (Clemente Licea, O)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for James Kalaaukahi, CDCR No. BM-3150, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Huang, H)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 E-FILING NOTICE issued re complaint filed *6/29/2023*. (Huang, H) Modified on 7/5/2023 (Huang, H).
July 5, 2023 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Transfer Order and #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on James Kalaaukahi, with CDCR Number. (Huang, H)
July 5, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 E-Filing Notice served on James Kalaaukahi. (Huang, H)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Flores, E)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/30/2023. CASE TRANSFERRRED to Sacramento Division. New Case Number 2:23-cv-01268 JDP.(Flores, E)
June 30, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order served on James Kalaaukahi. (Flores, E)
June 29, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Kalaaukahi. (Flores, E)
June 29, 2023 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Crosby, B. Dower, B. Jones, H. Ortiz, Y. Salinas Gonzalez, B. Williams by James Kalaaukahi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Kalaaukahi v. Salinas Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kalaaukahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Salinas Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?