Hill v. CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon et al
Plaintiff: D'Vaughn Cortez Hill
Defendant: CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon, Dr. Donback and Dr. Jeu
Case Number: 2:2023cv01313
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/1/2023 DENYING #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Clemente Licea, O)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order served on D'Vaughn Cortez Hill. (Clemente Licea, O)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon, Dr. Donback, Dr. Jeu by D'Vaughn Cortez Hill.(Lopez, K)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by D'Vaughn Cortez Hill. (Murphy, J)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 07/27/2023 DISMISSING the #1 Complaint with leave to amend. First Amended Complaint due within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Spichka, K.)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on D'Vaughn Cortez Hill. (Spichka, K.)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:23-cv-01681.
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on D'Vaughn Cortez Hill. (Marrujo, C)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/30/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 6/28/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/28/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/29/2023 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by D'Vaughn Hill. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2023) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by D'Vaughn Hill. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2023) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by D'Vaughn Hill, CDCR # BG1025.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2023) [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon, Dr. Donback, Dr. Jeu. Filed by D'Vaughn Hill. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2023) Modified on 4/7/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Vaughn Cortez Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Contract Physician/Surgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Donback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?