USA v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James K. Ward and Carol J. Ward
Case Number: 2:2023cv01445
Filed: July 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew David Carlson on behalf of Carol J. Ward, James K. Ward. Attorney Carlson, Matthew David added. (Carlson, Matthew)
August 7, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 7, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:23-CV-1445 KJM CKD. (Reader, L)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Carol J. Ward on 8/3/2023, Answer due 10/2/2023 (Pestovich, Connor)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to James K. Ward on 8/3/2023, Answer due 10/2/2023 (Pestovich, Connor)
July 27, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pestovich, Connor)
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Carol J. Ward, James K. Ward* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Connor Pestovich* *U.S. Department of Justice Tax Division* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to reduce tax assessments to Judgment by United States of America. Attorney Pestovich, Connor added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pestovich, Connor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Connor Pestovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Ward
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol J. Ward
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?