Penn-Star In. Co., Inc. v. Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service et al
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service, Omer Daraz Gorsi, Hernan Pavonordaz, Erika Vargas, Arsenio Nicolas Gonzalez, Jorge Andres Yanez-Perez, Amrit Kaur Kooner and Narinder Kaur
Case Number: 2:2023cv01663
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jorge Andres Yanez-Perez served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Erika Vargas served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Omer Daraz Gorsi served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Narinder Kaur served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Amrit Kaur Kooner served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Wendell, Megan)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Penn-Star Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wendell, Megan)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel N. Katibah on behalf of Penn-Star Insurance Company, Inc.. Attorney Katibah, Daniel N. added. (Katibah, Daniel)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arsenio Nicolas Gonzalez, Omer Daraz Gorsi, Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service, Narinder Kaur, Amrit Kaur Kooner, Hernan Pavonordaz, Erika Vargas, Jorge Andres Yanez-Perez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Megan W. Wendell* *Nielsen Katibah, LLP* *2356 Gold Meadow Way, Suite 240* *Gold River, California 95670*. (Reader, L)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company (Wendell, Megan)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants by Penn-Star Insurance Company, Inc. Attorney Wendell, Megan Winter added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11010237) (Wendell, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn-Star In. Co., Inc. v. Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel N. Katibah
Represented By: Megan Winter Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorsi Brothers Farm Labor Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omer Daraz Gorsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Pavonordaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenio Nicolas Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Andres Yanez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrit Kaur Kooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narinder Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?