Roper v. Healthcare Mgt. Administrators, inc et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Roper
Defendant: Healthcare Management Administrators, inc, G5 Search Marketing, Inc and G5 Health and Welfare Plan
Case Number: 2:2023cv01855
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Healthcare Management Administrators, inc. Attorney Neumann, Jon T. added. (Neumann, Jon)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/2023 EXTENDING the deadline for G5 Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 11/27/2023. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by G5 Health and Welfare Plan, G5 Search Marketing, Inc. Attorney Chien, Jenny Chuni added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chien, Jenny) Modified on 10/20/2023 (Clemente Licea, O).
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *G5 Health and Welfare Plan, G5 Search Marketing, Inc, Healthcare Management Administrators, inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Lilienstein* *Dl Law Group* *345 Franklin Street* *San Francisco, CA 94102*. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Catherine Roper. Attorney Lilienstein, David added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11046149) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roper v. Healthcare Mgt. Administrators, inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Roper
Represented By: David Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Management Administrators, inc
Represented By: Jon T. Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G5 Search Marketing, Inc
Represented By: Jenny Chuni Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G5 Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Jenny Chuni Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?