(PS) Andrades v. City of Manteca Police Dept., et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Stewart Andrades
Defendant: City of Manteca Police Department, Brandon Lowry, Raul Hernandez, Timothy Medina and Devin Brooks
Case Number: 2:2023cv01905
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPPOSITION to #7 Motion for Summary Judgment by Anthony Stewart Andrades. (Lopez, K)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/2023 re #7 Motion for Judgment. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, November 22, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #7 Motion for Judgment, : Motion Hearing RESET for 11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Swingle, Bradley) Modified on 10/18/2023 (Clemente Licea, O).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/2023: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21) Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. #7 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Defendants shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for available law and motion dates and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 11/30/2023 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Devin Brooks et al., Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Swingle, Bradley) Modified on 10/18/2023 (Clemente Licea, O).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE Added attorney Graham Scott for Devin Brooks, City of Manteca Police Department, Raul Hernandez, Brandon Lowry, Timothy Medina. (Swingle, Bradley) Modified on 10/18/2023 (Clemente Licea, O).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order served on Anthony Stewart Andrades. (Anderson, J)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Anthony Stewart Andrades. (Krueger, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Devin Brooks, City of Manteca Police Department, Raul Hernandez, Brandon Lowry, Timothy Medina.(Swingle, Bradley)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to REMAND CASE to State Court by Anthony Stewart Andrades. (Nair, C)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Swingle, Bradley)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Donati, J)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UCR-2023-0007368 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11056411) ((Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Swingle, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Andrades v. City of Manteca Police Dept., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Stewart Andrades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manteca Police Department
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Lowry
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Hernandez
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Medina
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Brooks
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Represented By: Graham Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?