(SS) Crocker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Crocker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2023cv02132
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marriott, Michael)
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Michael K. Marriott, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Marriott, Michael)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement](Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline Anna Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement](Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2023 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11102290. (Bosavanh, Sengthiene)
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Rhonda Jean Crocker. Attorney Forslund, Jacqueline Anna added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Crocker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Crocker
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?